LA SB10 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the payment of certain system administrative expenses. (6/10/16) (EG NO IMPACT APV)
Title
Provides for the payment of certain system administrative expenses. (6/10/16) (EG NO IMPACT APV)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |