LA HR99 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests each member of the Louisiana House of Representatives to voluntarily serve as a substitute teacher in a public school

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests each member of the Louisiana House of Representatives to voluntarily serve as a substitute teacher in a public school

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-26 - House - House Vote on HR 99 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1191) (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - House - House Vote on HR 99 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1191) (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-01HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2022-05-31HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2022-05-26HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 78, nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
2022-05-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2022.
2022-05-25HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2022-05-24HouseReported with amendments (13-0).
2022-05-03HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2022-05-02HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback