LA HR9 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the House clerk and sergeant at arms to recommend to the Speaker procedures for the inspection of deliveries to members on the House Floor and to submit to the House and Governmental Affairs Committee recommendations relative to House Rules prior to the 2012 Regular Session
Title
Requests the House clerk and sergeant at arms to recommend to the Speaker procedures for the inspection of deliveries to members on the House Floor and to submit to the House and Governmental Affairs Committee recommendations relative to House Rules prior to the 2012 Regular Session
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - House - House Vote on HR 9, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#465) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2011-06-08 | Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | |
2011-06-08 | Called from the calendar. | |
2011-06-08 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2011-06-06 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/8/2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/7/2011. | |
2011-05-25 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2011-05-24 | Reported favorably (13-0). | |
2011-04-26 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |