LA HR74 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Louisiana Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics (STEM) Innovation Caucus
Title
Establishes the Louisiana Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics (STEM) Innovation Caucus
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - House - House Vote on HR 74 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#863) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2021-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-01 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2021-05-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2021. |
2021-05-27 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-26 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2021-05-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-05-10 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |