LA HR68 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests that certain federal funds received be deployed by the Louisiana Economic Development Corporation for certain state seed capital programs
Title
Requests that certain federal funds received be deployed by the Louisiana Economic Development Corporation for certain state seed capital programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - House - House Vote on HR 68 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#620) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2021-05-25 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-05-24 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2021-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2021. |
2021-05-13 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-13 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Commerce. |
2021-05-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2021-05-10 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |