LA HR66 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urges and requests the Department of Transportation and Development to study and work with Interstate 20 Amtrak partners to develop a passenger rail service connecting Texas and Mississippi through North Louisiana

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges and requests the Department of Transportation and Development to study and work with Interstate 20 Amtrak partners to develop a passenger rail service connecting Texas and Mississippi through North Louisiana

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - House Vote on HR 66 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#701) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2021-05-27HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-05-26HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
2021-05-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021.
2021-05-18HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-17HouseReported favorably (10-0).
2021-05-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2021-05-06HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback