LA HR62 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Tuesday, May 14, 2024, as FFA day at the state capitol and commends the state officers of the Louisiana FFA Association
Title
Designates Tuesday, May 14, 2024, as FFA day at the state capitol and commends the state officers of the Louisiana FFA Association
Sponsors
Rep. Troy Romero [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2024-04-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |