LA HR59 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests the legislative auditor to conduct an audit of the Recreation and Park Commission for the Parish of East Baton Rouge (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests the legislative auditor to conduct an audit of the Recreation and Park Commission for the Parish of East Baton Rouge (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - House Vote on HR 59 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#703) (Y: 53 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2018-05-07HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-03HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 53, nays 33. The resolution was adopted.
2018-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/03/18.
2018-04-26HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-25HouseReported with amendments (6-2).
2018-04-03HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-04-02HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback