LA HR52 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-02 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-02 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests that the Board of Supervisors of Community and Technical Colleges and Board of Regents study and report relative to changes needed for community and technical colleges in response to COVID-19
Title
Requests that the Board of Supervisors of Community and Technical Colleges and Board of Regents study and report relative to changes needed for community and technical colleges in response to COVID-19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on HR 52 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#753) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-01 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2020-05-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/20. |
2020-05-28 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2020-05-21 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education. |