LA HR51 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to study of compassionate release, medical treatment furlough, and medical parole requirements
Title
Provides relative to study of compassionate release, medical treatment furlough, and medical parole requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - House - House Vote on HR 51 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#862) (Y: 71 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2021-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-01 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 71, nays 8. The resolution was adopted. |
2021-05-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2021. |
2021-05-27 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-26 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2021-05-13 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-05-12 | House | Reported with amendments (7-0). |
2021-05-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2021-05-03 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |