LA HR42 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes April 18, 2019, as Lineman Appreciation Day in Louisiana
Title
Recognizes April 18, 2019, as Lineman Appreciation Day in Louisiana
Sponsors
Rep. John Anders [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2019-04-17 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-04-15 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |