LA HR37 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires recommittal of certain legislative instruments relative to felonies to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice and removes the requirement to lock the voting machine of a member who fails to answer roll call during Morning Hour No. 1
Title
Requires recommittal of certain legislative instruments relative to felonies to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice and removes the requirement to lock the voting machine of a member who fails to answer roll call during Morning Hour No. 1
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - House - House Vote on HR 37, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#466) (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2011-06-08 | Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 79, nays 15. The resolution was adopted. | |
2011-06-08 | Called from the calendar. | |
2011-06-08 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2011-06-06 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/8/2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/7/2011. | |
2011-05-25 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2011-05-24 | Reported favorably (10-0). | |
2011-05-16 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2011-05-12 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |