LA HR36 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the House Committee on Insurance to study and make recommendations regarding the effects of making the commissioner of insurance an appointed position
Title
Requests the House Committee on Insurance to study and make recommendations regarding the effects of making the commissioner of insurance an appointed position
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - House - House Vote on HR 36 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#121) (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-06-29 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-25 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 6. The resolution was adopted. |
2020-06-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/25/20. |
2020-06-24 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-06-24 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2020-06-22 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2020-06-18 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |