LA HR32 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Monday, April 15, 2019 as ExxonMobil Day at the capitol
Title
Designates Monday, April 15, 2019 as ExxonMobil Day at the capitol
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2019-04-15 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-04-10 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |