LA HR300 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates June 4, 2019, as Girl Scouts of the United States of America Day at the state capitol and recognizes the one hundred seventh anniversary of the founding of Girl Scouting
Title
Designates June 4, 2019, as Girl Scouts of the United States of America Day at the state capitol and recognizes the one hundred seventh anniversary of the founding of Girl Scouting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2019-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-05 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |