LA HR3 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allows interpreters designated by the Speaker to be admitted to the House floor

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows interpreters designated by the Speaker to be admitted to the House floor

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-07 - House - House Vote on HR 3 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#754) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2018-05-08HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-07HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
2018-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/07/18.
2018-04-27HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-26HouseReported favorably (6-0).
2018-03-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-03-12HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback