LA HR272 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the State Civil Service Commission to consult with and advise the LSU Health Sciences Center New Orleans and LSU Health Sciences Center Shreveport on the feasibility and desirability of participating in the state employee leave transfer program
Title
Requests the State Civil Service Commission to consult with and advise the LSU Health Sciences Center New Orleans and LSU Health Sciences Center Shreveport on the feasibility and desirability of participating in the state employee leave transfer program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on HR 272 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1655) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2022-06-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2022. |
2022-06-05 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |