LA HR260 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requests the Louisiana Department of Health to study the feasibility of issuing a certification card to individuals with an autism spectrum disorder diagnosis

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests the Louisiana Department of Health to study the feasibility of issuing a certification card to individuals with an autism spectrum disorder diagnosis

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-06-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/04/19.
2019-06-02HouseRead by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-31HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback