LA HR251 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Department of Transportation and Development to study transportation options for western St. Tammany Parish
Title
Urges and requests the Department of Transportation and Development to study transportation options for western St. Tammany Parish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on HR 251 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1649) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on HR 251 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1649) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on HR 251 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1649) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2022. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |