LA HR25 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Louisiana Public Service Commission to investigate the benefits, feasibility, costs, and pathways to achieving a demonstrable offshore wind energy pilot project by 2026
Title
Urges and requests the Louisiana Public Service Commission to investigate the benefits, feasibility, costs, and pathways to achieving a demonstrable offshore wind energy pilot project by 2026
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - House - House Vote on HR 25 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#536) (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Vote on HR 25 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#536) (Y: 80 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Vote on HR 25 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#536) (Y: 80 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-05-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-02 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 81, nays 9. The resolution was adopted. |
2022-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/2022. |
2022-04-26 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2022-03-29 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2022-03-28 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |