LA HR25 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-9-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-9-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes April 20, 2021, as Young Marines Day at the state capitol and commends the Jefferson Parish Sheriff's Office Young Marines unit for their recognition as National Unit of the Year
Title
Recognizes April 20, 2021, as Young Marines Day at the state capitol and commends the Jefferson Parish Sheriff's Office Young Marines unit for their recognition as National Unit of the Year
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2021-04-20 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-04-19 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |