LA HR24 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes March 21, 2018, as Stop the Bleed Day at the capitol and commends the U.S. Department of Homeland Security's Stop the Bleed campaign
Title
Recognizes March 21, 2018, as Stop the Bleed Day at the capitol and commends the U.S. Department of Homeland Security's Stop the Bleed campaign
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-03-21 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-03-20 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |