LA HR233 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Department of Environmental Quality to study the feasibility of expanding the testing of child-occupied facilities for lead and mercury
Title
Urges and requests the Department of Environmental Quality to study the feasibility of expanding the testing of child-occupied facilities for lead and mercury
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Vote on HR 233 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1000) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2019-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2019-06-05 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-06-04 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/19. |
2019-05-30 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-29 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2019-05-28 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |