LA HR228 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Louisiana State Law Institute to study evaluations conducted by mental health professionals used in child custody and visitation proceedings
Title
Requests the Louisiana State Law Institute to study evaluations conducted by mental health professionals used in child custody and visitation proceedings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on HR 228 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1639) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2022. |
2022-06-02 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-06-01 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |