LA HR203 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests the La. Department of Health to study and make recommendations concerning consumer protection measures relative to kratom

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests the La. Department of Health to study and make recommendations concerning consumer protection measures relative to kratom

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on HR 203 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#629) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2019-05-30HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-29HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
2019-05-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19.
2019-05-22HouseRead by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback