LA HR199 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests a study of the use of facial recognition data by law enforcement
Title
Requests a study of the use of facial recognition data by law enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - House - House Vote on HR 199 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1215) (Y: 65 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2021-06-10 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-10 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 65, nays 30. The resolution was adopted. |
2021-06-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/10/2021. |
2021-06-09 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-06-08 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |