LA HR19 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Approves the annual state integrated coastal protection plan for Fiscal Year 2021, as adopted by the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority Board
Title
Approves the annual state integrated coastal protection plan for Fiscal Year 2021, as adopted by the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-18 - House - House Vote on HR 19 HR 19 BY ZERINGUE (#182) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-05-19 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2020-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/20. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-13 | House | Reported favorably (12-2). |
2020-05-07 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2020-05-07 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported favorably (12-1). To be recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2020-05-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2020-03-31 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |