LA HR177 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests the La. Department of Health to study the scheduling of Mitragyna speciosa (kratom) as a controlled dangerous substance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests the La. Department of Health to study the scheduling of Mitragyna speciosa (kratom) as a controlled dangerous substance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on HR 177 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1140) (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2018-05-17HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-16HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 75, nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
2018-05-08HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/16/18.
2018-05-08HouseRead by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-05-07HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback