LA HR160 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes and directs the Department of Insurance to study and make recommendations regarding the effect of mandated uninsured motorist coverage on automobile insurance rates
Title
Authorizes and directs the Department of Insurance to study and make recommendations regarding the effect of mandated uninsured motorist coverage on automobile insurance rates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on HR 160 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1636) (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 80, nays 12. The resolution was adopted. |
2022-06-06 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-06-06 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2022. |
2022-05-31 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-31 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Insurance. |
2022-05-23 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2022-05-19 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |