LA HR16 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-02 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-02 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Continues the Vera Institute of Justice's study of eligibility and qualification requirements for jurors
Title
Continues the Vera Institute of Justice's study of eligibility and qualification requirements for jurors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on HR 16 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#751) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-01 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2020-05-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/20. |
2020-05-22 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-22 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2020-05-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2020-03-31 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |