LA HR157 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Motor Vehicle Commission to examine its interpretation of statutes applicable to recreational product dealer licenses for certain marine products dealers
Title
Urges and requests the Motor Vehicle Commission to examine its interpretation of statutes applicable to recreational product dealer licenses for certain marine products dealers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-02 - House - House Vote on HR 157 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#649) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2017-06-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2017-06-02 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-06-02 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-05-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/17. |
2017-05-31 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-30 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2017-05-25 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2017-05-24 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |