LA HR149 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urge and requests the Amite River Basin Commission to study tidal surge flood protection and erosion on Lake Maurepas' Livingston Parish shoreline and the effects of dredging of the Amite River
Title
Urge and requests the Amite River Basin Commission to study tidal surge flood protection and erosion on Lake Maurepas' Livingston Parish shoreline and the effects of dredging of the Amite River
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - House - House Vote on HR 149 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1125) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-05-26 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-25 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2022-05-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2022. |
2022-05-24 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-23 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2022-05-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-05-17 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |