LA HR145 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests the Department of Environmental Quality in conjunction with the Louisiana Department of Health to study the effects of evolving 5G technology

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests the Department of Environmental Quality in conjunction with the Louisiana Department of Health to study the effects of evolving 5G technology

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on HR 145 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#634) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2019-05-30HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-29HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 103, nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
2019-05-29HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19.
2019-05-22HouseNotice given.
2019-05-22HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
2019-05-16HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-15HouseReported with amendments (11-0).
2019-05-14HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2019-05-13HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback