LA HR14 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-20 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests a study and report on nonemergency medical transportation in the Medicaid managed care program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests a study and report on nonemergency medical transportation in the Medicaid managed care program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-15 - House - House Vote on HR 14 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#138) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-20HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2020-10-19HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-10-15HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 91,nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
2020-10-14HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/15/20.
2020-10-14HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-10-14HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-14HouseReported favorably (15-0).
2020-10-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback