LA HR14 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Designates Tuesday, May 22, 2018, as LSU AgCenter Day at the state capitol

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates Tuesday, May 22, 2018, as LSU AgCenter Day at the state capitol

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2018-03-20HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-03-19HouseRead by title, rules suspended, adopted.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback