LA HR131 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a commission to study the crime of communicating false information of a planned bombing on school property, at a school-sponsored function, or in a firearm-free zone when the offender is a juvenile
Title
Creates a commission to study the crime of communicating false information of a planned bombing on school property, at a school-sponsored function, or in a firearm-free zone when the offender is a juvenile
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - House - House Vote on HR 131 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#612) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2023-05-25 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-05-24 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2023-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2023. |
2023-05-18 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-17 | House | Reported favorably (8-0-1). |
2023-05-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2023-05-09 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |