LA HR130 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes Monday, May 22, 2017, as LUMCON at the Capitol Day
Title
Recognizes Monday, May 22, 2017, as LUMCON at the Capitol Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2017-05-22 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-05-18 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |