LA HR13 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a study group to study law enforcement systems and policing
Title
Establishes a study group to study law enforcement systems and policing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-06-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/16/20. |
2020-06-11 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-06-10 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0-1). |
2020-06-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-06-08 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |