LA HR129 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Catahoula Lake Study Group
Title
Creates the Catahoula Lake Study Group
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-19 - House - House Vote on HR 129 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#983) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-05-23 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-19 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2022-05-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2022. |
2022-05-16 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-16 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2022-05-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2022-05-11 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |