LA HR12 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Continues the task force created by House Resolution No. 174 of the 2023 R.S. to study the educational programs in the prisons and jails of this state

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Continues the task force created by House Resolution No. 174 of the 2023 R.S. to study the educational programs in the prisons and jails of this state

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-11 - House - House Vote on HR 12 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#431) (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-16HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2024-04-15HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2024-04-11HouseRead by title, amended, roll called, yeas 81, nays 3. The resolution was adopted.
2024-04-11HouseCalled from the calendar.
2024-04-10HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/11/2024.
2024-04-10HouseNotice given.
2024-04-10HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2024-04-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/10/2024.
2024-04-08HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2024-04-04HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2024-03-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2024-03-11HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback