LA HR12 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates a task force to study the assessment of fees to students at public and certain nonpublic elementary and secondary schools

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a task force to study the assessment of fees to students at public and certain nonpublic elementary and secondary schools

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-28 - House - House Vote on HR 12 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#18) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2018-05-29HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-28HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
2018-05-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/28/18.
2018-05-25HouseRead by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-05-24HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback