LA HR12 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates and provides for the Fiscal Note Review Committee and provides for the locking of a member's voting machine under certain circumstances

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates and provides for the Fiscal Note Review Committee and provides for the locking of a member's voting machine under certain circumstances

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-26 Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2010-05-25 Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 63, nays 24. The resolution was adopted.
2010-05-25 Called from the calendar.
2010-05-18 Scheduled for floor debate on May 25, 2010.
2010-05-18 Notice given.
2010-05-18 Read by title, returned to the calendar.
2010-05-13 Scheduled for floor debate on May 18, 2010.
2010-05-13 Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2010-05-12 Reported with amendments (9-3).
2010-04-06 Read by title, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2010-04-05 Read by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback