LA HR119 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 48-29-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests the state Department of Education to re-create a commission to study and make recommendations relative to improving reading proficiency for certain students

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests the state Department of Education to re-create a commission to study and make recommendations relative to improving reading proficiency for certain students

Sponsors

Rep. Jason Hughes [D]Rep. Daryl Adams [I]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]
Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]Rep. Beau Beaullieu [R]Rep. Stuart Bishop [R]Rep. Ryan Bourriaque [R]
Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Chad Brown [D]Rep. Marcus Bryant [D]Rep. Rhonda Butler [R]
Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D]Rep. Dewith Carrier [R]Rep. Gary Carter [D]Rep. Wilford Carter [D]
Rep. Mack Cormier [D]Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. Raymond Crews [R]
Rep. Paula Davis [R]Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R]Rep. Daryl Deshotel [R]Rep. Mary DuBuisson [R]
Rep. Royce Duplessis [D]Rep. Michael Echols [R]Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]Rep. Gabe Firment [R]
Rep. Aimee Freeman [D]Rep. Barbara Freiberg [R]Rep. Randal Gaines [D]Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]
Rep. Brett Geymann [R]Rep. Jonathan Goudeau [R]Rep. Lance Harris [R]Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]
Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. Barry Ivey [R]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]
Rep. Mike Johnson [R]Rep. Travis Johnson [D]Rep. Frederick Jones [D]Rep. Edmond Jordan [D]
Rep. Timothy Kerner [R]Rep. Jeremy LaCombe [D]Rep. Mandie Landry [D]Rep. Ed Larvadain [D]
Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]Rep. Tanner Magee [R]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]Rep. Joseph Marino [I]
Rep. Scott McKnight [R]Rep. Wayne McMahen [R]Rep. Blake Miguez [R]Rep. Dustin Miller [D]
Rep. Gregory Miller [R]Rep. Pat Moore [D]Rep. Nicholas Muscarello [R]Rep. Richard Nelson [R]
Rep. Candace Newell [D]Rep. Joseph Orgeron [R]Rep. Charles Owen [R]Rep. Tammy Phelps [D]
Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]Rep. Thomas Pressly [R]Rep. Troy Romero [R]Rep. Rodney Schamerhorn [R]
Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. Laurie Schlegel [R]Rep. Larry Selders [D]Rep. Vincent St. Blanc [R]
Rep. Joseph Stagni [R]Rep. Polly Thomas [R]Rep. Christopher Turner [R]Rep. Debbie Villio [R]
Rep. William Wheat [R]Rep. Matthew Willard [D]Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]

Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on HR 119 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1006) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2021-06-08HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-07HouseRead by title, amended, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
2021-06-07HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-06-07HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-06-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2021.
2021-06-03HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-06-02HouseReported favorably (11-0).
2021-05-25HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-05-24HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback