LA HR118 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes May 10, 2022, as Baton Rouge Young Professionals Day at the state capitol and commends the board of directors of Forum 225
Title
Recognizes May 10, 2022, as Baton Rouge Young Professionals Day at the state capitol and commends the board of directors of Forum 225
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-05-10 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-09 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |