LA HR101 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests that the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education study and submit a report relative to the provision of mental health services in schools and the possibility of providing mental health education to certain students

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests that the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education study and submit a report relative to the provision of mental health services in schools and the possibility of providing mental health education to certain students

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - House - House Vote on HR 101 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#902) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2021-06-03HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-02HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
2021-06-01HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2021.
2021-06-01HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-27HouseReported favorably (11-0).
2021-05-19HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-05-18HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback