LA HR101 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Louisiana Athletic Trainers Association and designates April 17, 2018, as LATA Day at the state capitol
Title
Commends the Louisiana Athletic Trainers Association and designates April 17, 2018, as LATA Day at the state capitol
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-04-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-04-17 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |