LA HR1 | 2017 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the standing committee jurisdiction over matters regarding drinking water standards and water resources
Title
Provides relative to the standing committee jurisdiction over matters regarding drinking water standards and water resources
Sponsors
Rep. Stuart Bishop [R] | Rep. Frank Hoffmann [R] | Rep. Kenny Cox [D] | Rep. Marcus Hunter [D] |
Sen. Katrina Jackson-Andrews [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - House - House Vote on HR 1 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#43) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-24 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2017-02-22 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-02-22 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2017-02-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/22/17. |
2017-02-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/21/17. |
2017-02-20 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-02-20 | House | Rules suspended. |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported favorably (7-0). |
2017-02-13 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |