LA HCSR4 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-04 - The request, having received objections from at least one-third of the elected members, was not approved.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-04 - The request, having received objections from at least one-third of the elected members, was not approved.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requests a study of the procedures for law enforcement officers under investigation who are required to submit to a polygraph and to study the effects of having a representative present while the polygraph is being conducted
Title
Requests a study of the procedures for law enforcement officers under investigation who are required to submit to a polygraph and to study the effects of having a representative present while the polygraph is being conducted
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | House | The request, having received objections from at least one-third of the elected members, was not approved. |
2021-06-01 | House | Study request list distributed to members on 6/1/2021. |
2021-05-13 | House | Received on 5/13/2021. |