LA HCSR3 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Approved on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requests a study of the procedures for processing felony sentences and calculating incarceration release dates of persons in the custody of DPS&C

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests a study of the procedures for processing felony sentences and calculating incarceration release dates of persons in the custody of DPS&C

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07SenateApproved on 6/7/2019.
2019-06-02SenateStudy request list distributed to the members on 6/2/2019.
2019-06-02SenateRequest study by the committees on Judiciary B and Judiciary C.
2019-06-02SenateReceived by the Senate Office on 6/2/2019.
2019-06-02HouseSent to the Senate.
2019-05-30HouseStudy request list distributed to members on 5/30/2019.
2019-05-30HouseReceived on 5/30/2019.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback