LA HCSR3 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-04 - Returned to house of origin and approved on 6/4/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-04 - Returned to house of origin and approved on 6/4/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Study funding for cost-of-living adjustments for retired members of state systems
Title
Study funding for cost-of-living adjustments for retired members of state systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | Returned to house of origin and approved on 6/4/2012. | |
2012-06-04 | Approved on 6/4/12. | |
2012-05-31 | Study request list distributed to the members on 5/31/12. | |
2012-05-31 | Request study by the committee on Retirement. | |
2012-05-31 | Received by the Senate Office on 5/31/12. | |
2012-05-31 | Sent to the Senate. | |
2012-05-29 | Study request list distributed to members on 5/29/2012. | |
2012-05-22 | Received on 5/21/2012. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=12rs&billid=HCSR3 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=803793 |